CT SB00307 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority from transferring certain funds that were collected from towns for the purpose of monitoring landfills.
Title
An Act Concerning The Transfer Of Certain Funds Of The Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |