CT SB00302 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 247
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 247
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish a resident quality of life improvement grant program, (2) establish a housing choice voucher task force, and (3) require the disclosure of certain natural person ownership interests in real property.
Title
An Act Establishing A Housing Authority Resident Quality Of Life Improvement Grant Program And A Housing Choice Voucher Task Force And Requiring The Disclosure Of Certain Natural Person Ownership Interests In Real Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | File Number 247 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 198 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |