CT SB00298 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 232
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 232
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To address the tremendous backlog by USDA facilities to process farmer's livestock.
Title
An Act Concerning Permitting For Local Butcher Shops To Process Farmer-owned Livestock.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | File Number 232 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 157 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |