CT SB00298 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the court to find a factual basis for accepting a plea regarding the truth of allegations in certain juvenile matters.
Title
An Act Requiring A Factual Basis For Acceptance Of A Plea In Certain Juvenile Matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-12 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |