CT SB00297 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Social Services to amend the Medicaid state plan under Section 1915(i) of the Social Security Act.
Title
An Act Concerning An Amendment To The Medicaid State Plan Under Section 1915(i) Of The Social Security Act To Provide Home Care Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-25 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-25 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-19 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-17 | File Number 805 | |
2011-05-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-17 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/16/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-05-05 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-04 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 442 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 278 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-02 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |