CT SB00289 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require that statements of financial interests be filed electronically and to make such statements available to the public through the online posting of such statements.
Title
An Act Concerning The Online Submission And Posting Of Statements Of Financial Interests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-06 | File Number 296 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Calendar Number 209 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |