CT SB00285 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - House Calendar Number 427
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - House Calendar Number 427
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify that temporary family assistance benefits may be exempted from the twenty-one-month time limit during a state public health emergency, including, but not limited to, such emergency related to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
An Act Concerning Time Limits In The Temporary Family Assistance Program During A State Public Health Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 126 (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 427 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4458 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | File Number 220 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 176 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |