CT SB00283 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Children and Families to extend the age that a person in the custody of the department may receive legal representation through the department from age eighteen to twenty-three.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Extending The Age Of Eligibility For Legal Representation Provided By The Department Of Children And Families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-03-10SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2020-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/03
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback