CT SB00282 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to General Law
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to General Law
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Economic and Community Development to establish a Connecticut antiques trail.
Title
An Act Concerning The Development Of A Connecticut Antiques Trail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to General Law |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Transportation |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation |
2013-04-11 | Senate | File Number 432 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 296 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Commerce |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Change of Reference Commerce |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |