CT SB00277 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 211
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 211
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Transportation to restore service on the Shore Line East rail line.
Title
An Act Restoring Service On The Shore Line East Rail Line.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | File Number 211 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 157 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |