CT SB00271 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish certain student loan subsidies.
Title
An Act Concerning Student Loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-03-29 | Senate | File Number 163 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 152 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |