CT SB00260 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 393
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 393
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To apply substantial conflict of interest provisions in the state code of ethics for public officials and state employees to conflicts involving the public official's or state employee's nonstate employer or spouse's employer.
Title
An Act Concerning Conflicts Of Interest Due To An Employer Other Than The State Under The State Code Of Ethics For Public Officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 91 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 393 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 250 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 176 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |