CT SB00252 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 573
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 573
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the membership and duties of the Connecticut Food Policy Council.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Food Policy Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 132 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 573 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-10 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 710 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 327 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |