CT SB00251 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase job opportunities available to veterans by providing state grants and subsidies to businesses.
Title
An Act Concerning Veterans' Jobs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2012-04-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-11 | No New File by Committee on Commerce | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce | |
2012-03-27 | File Number 122 | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Calendar Number 124 | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-03-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-08 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |