CT SB00247 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Make minor revisions to statutes governing certain Probate Court procedures, and (2) within available appropriations, provide eligibility for grants under the Kinship Fund and Grandparents and Relatives Respite Fund to certain nonrelative caregivers.
Title
An Act Concerning Probate Court Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 262 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 191 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 191 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 18-45 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 521 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-16 | Senate | File Number 514 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 318 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |