CT SB00244 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand current reporting procedures and evidence maintenance procedures concerning injuries resulting from the discharge of a firearm and to include stab wound injuries as those wounds reported to local police departments or the state police.
Title
An Act Concerning The Reporting Of Injuries Resulting From The Discharge Of A Firearm And Stab Wounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 250 AS AMENDED (Y: 116 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 156 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 156 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 16-90 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 469 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4419 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | File Number 375 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 274 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |