CT SB00231 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the executive director of the Division of Special Revenue to negotiate settlements with delinquent lottery sales agents.
Title
An Act Creating An Amnesty Program For Delinquent Lottery Sales Agents.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Chapin [R] | Rep. Stephen Dargan [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
House Public Safety and Security Committee |
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-12 | Public Act 10-70 | |
2010-05-05 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | House Passed | |
2010-05-05 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-05-04 | House Calendar Number 524 | |
2010-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-04 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |
2010-05-04 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-15 | File Number 575 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Calendar Number 398 | |
2010-04-15 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-05 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-05 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-03-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2010-02-19 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety |