CT SB00220 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - File Number 208
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - File Number 208
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the operation of greyhound racing in the state.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Operation Of Greyhound Racing In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | File Number 208 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 131 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |