CT SB00218 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - File Number 30
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - File Number 30
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the creation and administration of a state-wide program for the delivery of bereavement and grief counseling services to children and families.
Title
An Act Establishing Task Forces To Study Bereavement And Grief Counseling Services And Social Isolation And Loneliness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | File Number 30 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 56 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |