CT SB00218 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Department of Public Health's recommendations for revisions to the statutes regarding human immunodeficiency virus.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations For Revisions To The Statutes Regarding Human Immunodeficiency Virus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 236 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 118 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 118 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 16-87 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 437 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4132 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | File Number 165 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 166 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |