CT SB00217 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for equine therapy for veterans.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Equine Therapy For Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |