CT SB00214 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - House Calendar Number 498
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - House Calendar Number 498
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Auditors of Public Accounts concerning the application of the state's whistle-blower statute to Probate Courts.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Auditors Of Public Accounts With Respect To Probate Courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 201 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 205 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 205 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 498 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-27 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | File Number 547 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 354 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |