CT SB00214 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide an incentive for the donation of a motor vehicle to a nonprofit organization serving veterans.
Title
An Act Concerning A Tax Credit For Donations Of Vehicles To Veterans' Organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |