CT SB00212 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make various technical changes concerning grammar, clarity and accuracy of internal references and consistency in the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Revisor's Technical Corrections To The General Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 110 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 110 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Public Act 24-24 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed |
2024-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 423 |
2024-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | File Number 484 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 275 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |