CT SB00208 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Calendar Number 568
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Calendar Number 568
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance policies that provide coverage for prescription drugs to provide coverage for intravenously administered drugs on a basis no less favorable than orally administered drugs.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage Of Orally And Intravenously Administered Medications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 255 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 9 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 9 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 568 |
2018-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-07 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 328 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 199 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |