CT SB00208 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify definitions and terminology related to the Department of Veterans Affairs and make technical and conforming changes.
Title
An Act Concerning Technical And Conforming Changes And Updates To The Department Of Veterans Affairs Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 213 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 217 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 213 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 217 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 16-167 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 524 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4288 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | File Number 99 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 134 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |