CT SB00208 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the statute of limitations for the recovery of taxes erroneously collected from veterans.
Title
An Act Concerning Refunds For Taxes Erroneously Collected From Veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] | Rep. Mary Fritz [D] | Rep. Frank Nicastro [D] | House Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-03-05 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-03-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-02 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs |