CT SB00204 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for certain surgical procedures performed to treat severe obesity.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Certain Surgical Procedures Performed To Treat Severe Obesity.
Sponsors
House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |