CT SB00204 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To improve the safety of children attending youth camps by requiring youth camps to (1) educate campers on Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases, (2) establish procedures for campers to report instances of injury and abuse, and (3) require directors and assistant directors at the youth camp to submit to certain background checks.
Title
An Act Concerning Campers' Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2014-03-19 | Senate | File Number 65 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 70 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |