CT SB00201 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical revisions to the planning and development statutes.
Title
An Act Making Technical Revisions To The Planning And Development Statutes, Delaying Revaluation For Certain Municipalities, Making Substantive Changes To Statutes Concerning Housing Blight And Authorizing The Modification Of Certain Electricity Purchase Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 393 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-24 | Public Act 10-152 | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B,C | |
2010-05-05 | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-05 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C | |
2010-05-05 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 5722 | |
2010-05-05 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5565 | |
2010-05-05 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5561 | |
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 401 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-06 | File Number 292 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Calendar Number 217 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-23 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |