CT SB00198 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a task force on the insurance industry workforce in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Methods Of Developing, Expanding And Improving The Insurance Industry Workforce In This State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 88 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-05-31SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-31SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-25SenateSpecial Act 18-21
2018-05-09SenateIn Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-09SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-04-25SenateHouse Calendar Number 449
2018-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-24SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-04-24SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-04-24SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3772
2018-03-28SenateFile Number 97
2018-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 81
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-16SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-15SenateJoint Favorable
2018-02-23SenatePublic Hearing 02/27
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback