CT SB00184 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize state grant commitments for school building projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects And Changes To The Statutes Concerning School Building Projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 308 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 266 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 266 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-24 | House | Public Act 18-138 |
2018-05-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 583 |
2018-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-08 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5822 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | File Number 418 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 243 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |