CT SB00183 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow package store liquor permit holders to conduct fee-based wine tastings and classes on their premises.
Title
An Act Concerning Retail Wine Sellers And Wine-related Classes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-16 | File Number 44 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Calendar Number 62 | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-04 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |