CT SB00180 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To enable children twelve years of age and older who are under the custody of the Department of Children and Families to have a more prominent voice during permanency hearings, to require youth advisory councils at certain child care facilities, to require the department to provide foster care family profiles to foster children and to solicit feedback from certain foster children to better recruit, train and retain high-quality foster parents.
Title
An Act Concerning Youth Advisory Councils And Foster Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 257 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 214 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 214 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 16-123 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 518 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3563 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | File Number 15 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 66 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |