CT SB00173 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To determine the fiscal impact on the state and feasibility of permitting the community spouse of an institutionalized Medicaid recipient to retain the maximum amount of assets allowed under federal law.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of The Cost And Feasibility Of Permitting The Community Spouse Of An Institutionalized Medicaid Recipient To Retain The Maximum Amount Of Allowable Assets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 247 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 158 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 158 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 22-121 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 441 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | File Number 89 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 95 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |