CT SB00165 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Developmental Services regarding technical changes to its statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Developmental Services' Recommendations For Revisions To Its Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 79 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 81 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 79 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 81 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 18-32 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 406 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3656 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | File Number 88 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 72 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |