CT SB00150 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - File Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - File Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Connecticut Infrastructure Authority.
Title
An Act Establishing The Connecticut Infrastructure Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | File Number 106 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 115 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |