CT SB00132 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-05 - House Calendar Number 530
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-05 - House Calendar Number 530
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To combat sexual harassment and sexual assault.
Title
An Act Combatting Sexual Harassment And Sexual Assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 195 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5151 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 196 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5170 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 197 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4955 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 198 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 5169 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 196 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5170 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 197 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4955 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 198 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 5169 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 530 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 5169 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 4955 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5170 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5151 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 604 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 355 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |