CT SB00126 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 316
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 316
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Children and Families to conduct in-person home visits if a safety plan established by the department indicates that a parent or guardian in such home has a substance use disorder.
Title
An Act Concerning In-person Home Visits By The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 57 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 58 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 58 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 316 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3687 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | File Number 8 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 27 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |