CT SB00120 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - File Number 134
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - File Number 134
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Banking to study and submit a report relating to lending issues in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Relating To Lending Issues In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | File Number 134 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 110 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |