CT SB00119 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-16 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-16 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a system of notices of activity and use limitation for certain contaminated properties in order to facilitate the future use of such properties.
Title
An Act Concerning Remediation Programs Of The Department Of Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-01 | File Number 239 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Calendar Number 175 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-16 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |