CT SB00116 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize municipalities to abate personal property taxes due from a business whose normal activities have been interrupted as a result of a major construction activity.
Title
An Act Concerning Personal Property Tax Relief For Businesses Affected By Major Construction Activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |