CT SB00111 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical revisions to statutes concerning planning and development.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Technical Revisions To Statutes Concerning Planning And Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |