CT SB00109 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 268
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 268
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect the state's natural resources.
Title
An Act Concerning The Designation Of Certain State Refuges For Wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 268 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 176 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |