CT SB00105 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Office of Higher Education.
Title
An Act Concerning Recommendations By The Office Of Higher Education And Extending The Time To Conduct A Sexual Misconduct Climate Assessment At Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 366 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 214 AS AMENDED (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 214 AS AMENDED (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | House | Public Act 22-123 |
2022-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended |
2022-05-04 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6384 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 533 |
2022-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5776 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 254 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 209 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |