CT SB00105 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - House Calendar Number 455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - House Calendar Number 455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the Department of Social Services to reduce funeral payments for assistance recipients when other funds are available and to regulate the types of funeral expenses that the department will cover.
Title
An Act Concerning The Payment Of Funeral And Burial Expenses By The Department Of Social Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 PASS (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 PASS (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 PASS (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 455 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-08 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-15 | Senate | File Number 53 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 86 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |