CT SB00105 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand workers' compensation coverage to individuals suffering from a severe mental or emotional impairment as a direct result of witnessing the death or maiming of another human being whose death or maiming was caused by an act of violence of another human being.
Title
An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation Coverage And Severe Mental And Emotional Impairment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |