CT SB00086 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide assistance to elderly homeowners who have fallen behind on real estate tax payments.
Title
An Act Establishing A Revolving Loan Fund To Assist Elderly Homeowners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |