CT SB00079 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - File Number 29
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - File Number 29
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To conform the continuing violation provision of such section of the general statutes to the intent of public act 14-100 by repealing reference to the use of a properly installed and constructed barrier system.
Title
An Act Clarifying Provisions Of The General Statutes Regarding The Use Of Properly Installed And Constructed Barrier Systems For Certain Plantings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | File Number 29 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 74 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |