CT SB00076 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the Commissioner of Transportation from expending state funds for a federal study of mileage tax on motor vehicles operated on state highways.
Title
An Act Concerning The Power Of The Commissioner Of Transportation To Conduct A Mileage Tax Study With State Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 385 AS AMENDED (Y: 116 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 205 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 205 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 17-174 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 587 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7785 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | File Number 399 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 221 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |